VA HB2183 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medicaid; eligibility of incarcerated individuals. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to convene a work group to identify and develop processes for streamlining the application and enrollment process for the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance services and the Family Access to Medical Insurance Security (FAMIS) program for eligible incarcerated individuals so that applicable services shall be available to such individuals immediately upon release from the correctional facility and to report its findings and recommendations by November 30, 2017.
Title
Medicaid; eligibility of incarcerated individuals.
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0198) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 198 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2183ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2183H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104644D-H1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104644D-H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101842D |