VA HB2181 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2181
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; technical amendments. Makes technical amendments to provisions of the Code of Virginia relating to the Virginia Retirement System to reflect recent changes to federal law and conform terminology to federal law.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; technical amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100855D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2181 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 1 | 124.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 157 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 168 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |