VA HB2181 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Coalbed methane gas; conflicting claims to ownership. Provides that, in order to establish a conflicting claim to the ownership of coalbed methane gas, a claimant who is not the surface owner must submit the document by which the interest in coalbed methane gas was severed from the surface estate and identify with specificity the writing that conveys such interest. Pursuant to statutory and case law, the Gas and Oil Board may not find a conflicting claim to the ownership to coalbed methane gas pursuant if the claimant fails to show a severance of mineral interests other than coal. Affirmative determinations by the Board to find a conflicting claim to the ownership of coalbed methane gas and to place the royalties attributable to such claims into an escrow account shall be considered a case decision under the Administrative Process Act. Upon the request of a claimant, the Board or a hearing officer appointed by the Board shall also review any pooling order entered prior to July 1, 2011, to ensure that previous claims have met the same threshold requirements.
Title
Coalbed methane gas; conflicting claims to ownership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-04 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-04 | House: Referred from Appropriations by voice vote | |
2011-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice (4-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105004D-H1 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #2 Natural Resources | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100018D |