VA HB2180 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2180
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Lynchburg. Provides that salaries of members of the Lynchburg City Council shall be determined in accordance with general law.
Title
Lynchburg, City of; amending charter, salaries of members of City Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred from Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100744D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2180 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)