VA HB2180 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; eligibility of certain persons. Entitles a person to vote absentee if he is unable to go in person to the polls on the day of the election because he is primarily and personally responsible for a child or for an ill or disabled individual who is confined at home. The bill also entitles a person to vote absentee if he lacks access to reliable personal transportation.
Title
Absentee voting; eligibility of certain persons.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Daun Hester [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101482D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2180 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2180+hil |