VA HB2180 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Drug Treatment Courts. Provides for the establishment of Drug Treatment Courts in Dickenson, Russell, and Wise Counties.
Title
Drug treatment courts; established in Dickenson, Russell, and Wise Counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2431-Kilgore) by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102670D |
Subjects
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Dickenson County
Narcotics and Drugs
Russell County
Wise County
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Dickenson County
Narcotics and Drugs
Russell County
Wise County
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2180 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2180+hil |