VA HB2179 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Form of ballot; order of independent candidates. Provides that when there is more than one independent candidate for an office, their names shall appear on the ballot in an order determined by the priority of time of filing all required paperwork for the office. In the event that two or more candidates file simultaneously, the order of filing is determined by lot by the electoral board. Currently, this order applies only to the names of candidates for school board, and the names of all other independent candidates appear alphabetically. This bill is identical to SB 1104.
Title
Form of ballot; order of independent candidates, required paperwork.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 352 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2179ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101229D-E |
2017-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2179E |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101229D |