VA HB2179 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Release of certain tax information. Permits the Department of Taxation to provide information subpoenaed by a grand jury without first submitting it to a court for a determination that the value of the information to the grand jury outweighs the value of confidentiality.
Title
Tax information; release to Commonwealth Attorneys and the Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 3-N) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 33-N) (Y: 66 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 33-N) (Y: 66 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 12-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (66-Y 33-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (66-Y 33-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103663D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2179E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 4-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103663D |