VA HB2178 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2178
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0095)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0095)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bonds for public institutions of higher learning; emergency. Authorizes issuance of bonds in an amount up to $34,136,000 for revenue-producing capital projects at Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.
Title
Commonwealth of Virginia Higher Educational Institutions Bond Act of 2021; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0095) | |
2021-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095) | |
2021-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 95 (effective 3/12/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2178ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102186D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2178 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
SB1145 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0096)
SB1145 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0096)
SB1145 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0096)
SB1145 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0096)
Subjects
Bond Issues
Emergency Legislation
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Uncodified Legislation
Emergency Legislation
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Uncodified Legislation