VA HB2178 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act (FOIA); proprietary records and trade secrets; charitable gaming supplies. Expands the existing FOIA record exclusion for information of a proprietary nature furnished by a supplier of charitable gaming supplies to the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to include such information submitted by manufacturers of charitable gaming supplies. The bill also expands the exclusion to include information submitted by suppliers and manufacturers of charitable gaming supplies pursuant to regulations promulgated by the Charitable Gaming Board related to approval of electronic and mechanical equipment.
Title
FOIA; proprietary records and trade secrets, charitable gaming supplies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 662 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2178ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103811D |
Subjects
Administrative Process Act
Charitable Gaming
Consumer Protection
Freedom of Information
Gambling Lotteries Etc.
Charitable Gaming
Consumer Protection
Freedom of Information
Gambling Lotteries Etc.