VA HB2177 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Charitable Gaming Board; exempt rulemaking for certain regulations. Provides that Charitable Gaming Board regulations relating to charitable gaming development, including game variations for the conduct of raffles, bingo, network bingo, and instant bingo games, shall be exempt from the Administrative Process Act, provided that (i) such variations result in games that are consistent with the provisions of charitable gaming law and Board regulations, (ii) such regulations are published and posted, and (iii) the Board files a copy of any such regulations with the Registrar of Regulations. This bill is identical to SB 1509.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Process Act; exemption for Charitable Gaming Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
2017-03-03 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 266 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2177ER)
2017-02-20HouseEnrolled
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 6-N)
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2177H1
2017-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17105018D-H1
2017-02-04HouseRead first time
2017-02-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105018D-H1
2017-02-02HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
2017-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
2017-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103808D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182340.19(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2177
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2177+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2177H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2177ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0266+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1103V0027+HB2177
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0109+HB2177
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2079+HB2177
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0126+HB2177
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0554HB2177+HB2177
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0597HB2177+HB2177
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0598HB2177+HB2177
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0599HB2177+HB2177

Bill Comments

feedback