VA HB2175 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; subtraction for military veterans with a service-connected disability. Establishes for taxable years beginning January 1, 2017, an individual income tax subtraction, for purposes of computing Virginia adjusted gross income, for the military retirement income of veterans with a 100 percent service-connected disability. The bill provides that the subtraction is available only for taxpayers whose federal adjusted gross income does not exceed 250 percent of the federal poverty level for a four-person household.
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for military veterans with a service-connected disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101210D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2175 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2175+hil |