VA HB2175 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans care center; construction in Northern Virginia. Authorizes the Governor to request federal funds to construct a new veterans care center in Northern Virginia, and requires the State Treasurer to issue a short-term treasury loan in an amount up to $28.5 million for the state share of construction costs, once the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs has determined that federal funds will be allocated for the new center.
Title
Veterans care center; construction in Northern Virginia.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] |
Del. Jackson Miller [R] | Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. James LeMunyon [R] | Del. David Ramadan [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031) | |
2013-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 31 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2175ER) |
2013-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2175H1 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104208D-H1 |
2013-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104208D-H1 |
2013-01-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13103642D |