VA HB2174 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; pupil/teacher ratios; public report. Requires each school board to annually report to the public the actual pupil/teacher ratios in middle school and high school by school for the current school year.
Title
School boards; annual report on pupil/teacher ratios in elementary, middle, etc., school classrooms.
Sponsors
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. James LeMunyon [R] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (58-Y 38-N) (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 21-N) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 21-N) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 321 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2174ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (58-Y 38-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (58-Y 38-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 21-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (75-Y 21-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (10-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 44-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 44-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17104662D-EH1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2174EH1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Appropriations Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Education Committee substitute agreed to 17104662D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104662D-H1 |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103665D |