VA HB2173 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Advanced recycling; definition. Defines "advanced recycling" as a manufacturing process for the conversion of post-use polymers and recovered feedstocks into basic hydrocarbon raw materials and other materials. The bill also defines "gasification," "post-use polymer," and other terms related to advanced recycling.
Title
Advanced recycling; not considered solid waste management, definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | House | Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Rereferred to Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-26 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2021-01-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102840D-E |
2021-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2173E |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (18-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102840D |