VA HB2173 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Class size limits; grades six through 12; science laboratory classes. Establishes a maximum class size of 24 students in science laboratory classes in grades six through 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Science laboratory classes; establishes a maximum class size of 24 students in grades 6 through 12.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-25 - House of Delegates - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House of Delegates - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08HouseLeft in Appropriations
2017-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-01-25HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2017-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-25HouseReported from Education (19-Y 2-N)
2017-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2017-01-20HouseAssigned Education sub: Education Innovation
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102269D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback