VA HB2173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Drinking water community confidence reports; publication. Requires the Board of Health to include in its regulations governing waterworks, water supplies, and pure water a process whereby waterworks serving fewer than 10,000 people may seek and the Board may grant a waiver of the requirement that the waterworks mail copies of its consumer confidence report to each customer of the waterworks at least once annually and provides for an alternate means of notifying customers of the existence of the consumer confidence report in a newspaper of general circulation or by other means as the Board may deem appropriate.
Title
Drinking water consumer confidence reports; publication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 804 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB2173ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2173ER) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2173H1 | |
2011-01-24 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104455D-H1 | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-20 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104455D-H1 | |
2011-01-20 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102672D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1024 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0843)