VA HB2171 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2171
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Small Business Financing Authority; annual report; utilization or award of loan and grant program funds. Requires the Virginia Small Business Financing Authority to include in its annual report information regarding the percentage of loan and grant program funds utilized or awarded by the Authority during the preceding fiscal year. This bill is a recommendation of the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission.
Title
Virginia Small Business Financing Authority; utilization or award of loan and grant program funds.
Sponsors
Del. Candi Mundon King [D] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-22 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101616D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2171 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)