VA HB2169 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Physician assistants; licensure by endorsement. Authorizes the Board of Medicine to issue a license by endorsement to an applicant for licensure as a physician assistant who (i) is the spouse of an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States or the Commonwealth, (ii) holds current certification from the National Commission on Certification of Physician Assistants, and (iii) holds a license as a physician assistant that is in good standing, or that is eligible for reinstatement if lapsed, under the laws of another state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician assistants; licensure by endorsement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 338 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2169ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-18SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-18SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 19103329D-E
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2169E
2019-02-01HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103329D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412951.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2169
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2169+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2169E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2169ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0338+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1201V0012+HB2169
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0051+HB2169
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2152+HB2169
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2226+HB2169
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0285+HB2169
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2169+HB2169
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2169+HB2169
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3055+HB2169

Bill Comments

feedback