VA HB2169 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; annual report on the condition and needs of public education in the Commonwealth. Changes from November 15 to December 1 the date by which the Board of Education is required to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly a report on the condition and needs of public education in the Commonwealth and identify any school divisions and schools that have failed to meet the existing prescribed standards of quality.
Title
Education, Board of; annual report on the condition & needs of public education in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Del. Daun Hester [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386) | |
2015-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2169ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101804D |