VA HB2168 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2168
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Illegal gambling; skill games; civil penalty; enforcement by localities and Attorney General. Provides that any person who conducts, finances, manages, supervises, directs, or owns a gambling device that is located in an unregulated location is subject to a civil penalty of up to $25,000. The bill provides that the Attorney General, an attorney for the Commonwealth, or the attorney for any locality may cause an action in equity to be brought in the name of the Commonwealth or of the locality, as applicable, to enjoin the operation of a gambling device in violation of this section and may request attachment against all such devices and any moneys within such devices. The bill provides that any civil penalties brought in the name of the Commonwealth shall be paid into the Literary Fund and that any civil penalties brought in the name of a locality shall be paid into the general fund of the locality. Illegal gambling; skill games; civil penalty; enforcement by localities and Attorney General. Provides that any person who conducts, finances, manages, supervises, directs, or owns a gambling device that is located in an unregulated location is subject to a civil penalty of up to $25,000. The bill provides that the Attorney General, an attorney for the Commonwealth, or the attorney for any locality may cause an action in equity to be brought in the name of the Commonwealth or of the locality, as applicable, to enjoin the operation of a gambling device in violation of this section and may request attachment against all such devices and any moneys within such devices. The bill provides that any civil penalties brought in the name of the Commonwealth shall be paid into the Literary Fund and that any civil penalties brought in the name of a locality shall be paid into the general fund of the locality.
Title
Illegal gambling; skill games, enforcement by localities and Attorney General, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Don Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 23-N) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N) (Y: 2 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 23-N) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N) (Y: 2 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0546) | |
2021-04-07 | House | Enacted, Chapter 546 (effective 7/1/21) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2168ER2) |
2021-04-07 | House | Reenrolled |
2021-04-07 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (28-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2021-04-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (76-Y 23-N) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (76-Y 23-N) |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2021-03-18 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2168ER) |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Agreed To (93-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-24 | House | Conference substitute printed 21200595D-H1 |
2021-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Morrissey, Stanley |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2021-02-19 | House | Delegates: Scott, Edmunds, Heretick |
2021-02-19 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2021-02-19 | House | House acceded to request |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (2-Y 97-N) |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (13-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101270D-E |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2168E |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101270D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2168 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)