VA HB2168 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Coal Train Heritage Authority. Creates the Virginia Coal Train Heritage Authority (the Authority) with rights and powers to be exercised by a 25-member board, which will consist of three representatives from the governing body of each of the Counties of Dickenson, Russell, and Wise; two citizen members from each of those three counties; one citizen member from each of the Towns of Clinchco, Haysi, and St. Paul; three commissioners of the Breaks Interstate Park Commission; two citizen members with experience in the excursion train business; and two members of the General Assembly. The Authority's powers are similar to those that other authorities possess. The bill authorizes the Authority to cooperate with any private or governmental entity in the state of West Virginia, Kentucky, Tennessee, or North Carolina in the development of a tourist train and exempts any train operator that has entered into a public-private partnership contract with the Authority from liability for personal injury or wrongful death except in the case of gross negligence or an intentional tort. Notice of such immunity must be posted at the time of ticketing and at all train entrances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Coal Train Heritage Authority; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 5-N) (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
2017-04-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 834 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05HouseCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05HousePassed by for the day
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's substitute printed 17105996D-H1
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2168ER)
2017-02-24HouseEnrolled
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 5-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (86-Y 5-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-17SenatePassed Senate with amendment (33-Y 7-N)
2017-02-17SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-17SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-17SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-17SenateRead third time
2017-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14SenateReported from Local Government with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2017-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
2017-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N)
2017-01-31HousePrinted as engrossed 17100382D-E
2017-01-31HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2168E
2017-01-31HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-01-31HouseRead second time
2017-01-30HouseRead first time
2017-01-27HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2017-01-19HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100382D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1526705(n/a)See Bill Text
1526710(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2168
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2168+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2168E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2168ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2168H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0834+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0701V0012+HB2168
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H07V0020+HB2168
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1796+HB2168
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S07V0074+HB2168
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0627HB2168+HB2168
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0664HB2168+HB2168
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2613+HB2168

Bill Comments

feedback