VA HB2167 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Parole; notice and certification; monthly reports; discretionary early consideration. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall set the release date for an inmate granted discretionary parole or conditional release no sooner than 30 business days from the date that the Department of Corrections receives notification from the Chairman of the Parole Board of the Board's decision to grant discretionary parole or conditional release, except that the Department of Corrections may set an earlier release date in the case of a terminally ill inmate granted conditional release. The bill provides that in the case of an inmate granted parole who was convicted of a felony and sentenced to a term of 10 or more years, or an inmate granted conditional release, the Board shall notify the attorney for the Commonwealth in the jurisdiction where the inmate was sentenced (i) by electronic means at least 21 business days prior to such inmate's release that such inmate has been granted discretionary parole or conditional release or (ii) by telephone or other electronic means prior to release that a terminally ill inmate has been granted conditional release where death is imminent. Parole; notice and certification; monthly reports; discretionary early consideration. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall set the release date for an inmate granted discretionary parole or conditional release no sooner than 30 business days from the date that the Department of Corrections receives notification from the Chairman of the Parole Board of the Board's decision to grant discretionary parole or conditional release, except that the Department of Corrections may set an earlier release date in the case of a terminally ill inmate granted conditional release. The bill provides that in the case of an inmate granted parole who was convicted of a felony and sentenced to a term of 10 or more years, or an inmate granted conditional release, the Board shall notify the attorney for the Commonwealth in the jurisdiction where the inmate was sentenced (i) by electronic means at least 21 business days prior to such inmate's release that such inmate has been granted discretionary parole or conditional release or (ii) by telephone or other electronic means prior to release that a terminally ill inmate has been granted conditional release where death is imminent. The bill requires that the monthly reports issued by the Board regarding actions taken on the parole of prisoners (a) be published on the fifteenth day of the month and (b) include the offenses of which prisoners considered for parole were convicted, the jurisdictions in which such offenses were committed, and the amount of time served by such prisoners. However, a prisoner's name shall be included on the report only if the attorney for the Commonwealth and any victims have been notified; otherwise, inclusion on the report is delayed to the following month. The bill also provides that if additional victim research is necessary, electronic notification shall be sent to the attorney for the Commonwealth and the director of the victim/witness program, if one exists, of the jurisdiction in which the offense occurred. The bill provides that the provisions regarding the monthly reports issued by the Board shall become effective on July 1, 2022.
Title
Parole; notice and certification, monthly reports, discretionary early consideration.
Sponsors
Del. Don Scott [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2167H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104290D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104290D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102627D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2167 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)