VA HB2166 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Criminal Justice Services; definition of law-enforcement officer; security division of the Virginia Lottery. Removes from the definition of law-enforcement officer, as it applies to an investigator who is a sworn member of the security division of the Virginia Lottery, the requirement that such investigator be a full-time member of the division.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement officer; change in definition, security division of Virginia Lottery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 475 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2166ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-13SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-25HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101931D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91101(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2166
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2166+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2166ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0475+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1502V0009+HB2166
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0015+HB2166
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0202V0015+HB2166
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0079+HB2166
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2469+HB2166
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0152+HB2166
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0371+HB2166
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2166+HB2166
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB2166+HB2166

Bill Comments

feedback