VA HB2165 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Sale of land for delinquent taxes. Extends from 36 to 60 months the time period for which a local tax official may suspend an action for the sale of tax delinquent property, which under current law is authorized if the owner enters into an agreement with the official to pay delinquent taxes in installments. The bill also authorizes an official to suspend an action if a person who is not a party to the action gives notice asserting ownership rights, by virtue of testate or intestate succession, in the property subject to the action. If a court determines such person has ownership rights in the property, such person may enter into an installment plan similar to what is authorized under current law. The bill provides that a final court order confirming sale of tax delinquent property shall not be entered sooner than the later of (i) 90 days after the official gives notice of the action or (ii) 90 days after the official receives notice from a person who is not a party to the action asserting ownership rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax delinquent property; sale of land for delinquent taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2021-01-16HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102775D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813965(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback