VA HB2165 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax exemptions in Frederick County. Repeals the property tax exemption in Frederick County for: the Potomac Appalachian Trail Club, the Nature Conservancy, The People-to-People Health Foundation, Inc., Cedar Creek Battlefield Foundation, Inc., Frederick United Methodist Housing Development, Northern Shenandoah Valley Association for Retarded Citizens, Northwestern Workshop, Inc., Robert E. Rose Memorial Foundation, Inc., Shalom Et Benedictus, Inc., Shenandoah Valley Community Residences, Inc., Special Love, Inc., the National Wildlife Federation, The Stone House Foundation, Wayside Foundation for the Arts, Inc., Wayside Museum of American History and Arts, Winchester Chapter of The Izaak Walton League of America, Westminster-Canterbury of Winchester, Inc., and Windy Hill Foundation.
Title
Property tax; exemptions for certain real property and nonprofit organizations in Frederick County.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Finance |
2015-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102860D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3650.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.246 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.381 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.382 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.452 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.453 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.566 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.569 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.667 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.668 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.684 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.754 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.755 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.79 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2165 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2165+hil |