VA HB2164 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Tobacco retail licensing; penalties. The bill prohibits any person from selling any tobacco product at retail without first obtaining a license from the Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (the Authority). The bill prohibits the sale of tobacco products and hemp products intended for smoking from vending machines. The bill imposes civil penalties on licensees for selling tobacco products without a license and for selling tobacco products to persons under age 21. Licenses would be subject to annual renewal and subject to revocation for violations of federal, state, or local laws related to tobacco products. The bill creates the Tobacco Retail Administration Subfund for the purpose of funding the Authority's costs of administering licenses and enforcing laws related to tobacco retail licensing. The bill updates, for the purpose of the crime of selling or distributing tobacco products to a person younger than 21 years of age, the definition of "tobacco products" by including in such definition products currently defined as nicotine vapor products or alternative nicotine products. The bill also removes provisions prohibiting the attempt to purchase, purchase, or possess tobacco products and hemp products intended for smoking by persons younger than 21 years of age. The bill also removes the exception allowing the sale of tobacco products to active-duty military personnel who are 18 years of age or older.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco; prohibits person from selling product at retail without license from ABC Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2021-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-28HouseReported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-24HouseAssigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102798D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182371.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182391(n/a)See Bill Text
221206(n/a)See Bill Text
221279.6(n/a)See Bill Text
22179.5(n/a)See Bill Text
41116(n/a)See Bill Text
41600(n/a)See Bill Text
41605(n/a)See Bill Text
591293.10(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback