VA HB2163 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
New media and technology innovation income tax credit. New media and technology innovation income tax credit. Establishes a new media and technology innovation income tax credit, starting with taxable year 2019, which is a nonrefundable tax credit for expenses related to producing in Virginia commercial advertisements, digital interactive media productions, and episodic television series. The bill allows a company to submit a single application for a project covering multiple tax years and requires such company to make available a third-party audit of its
Title
New media and technology innovation; establishes income tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-02-04 | House | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-04 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104582D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104582D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100986D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |