VA HB2163 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription of buprenorphine without naloxone; limitation. Provides that prescriptions for products containing buprenorphine without naloxone shall be issued only (i) for patients who are pregnant, (ii) when converting a patient from methadone to buprenorphine containing naloxone for a period not to exceed seven days, or (iii) as permitted by regulations of the Board of Medicine or the Board of Nursing. The bill contains an emergency clause and has an expiration date of July 1, 2022. This bill is identical to SB 1178.
Title
Buprenorphine without naloxone; prescription limitation.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Pillion [R] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. James Leftwich [R] | Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 794 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2163ER2) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Emergency clause deleted by Governor's recommendation | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2163ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 17105325D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2163S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105325D-S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105325D-S1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2163H1 |
2017-01-30 | House | Emergency clause added |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104675D-H1 |
2017-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104675D-H1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100981D |
Subjects
Emergency Legislation
Health
Narcotics and Drugs
Pregnancy
Prescription Medicines
Professions and Occupations
Health
Narcotics and Drugs
Pregnancy
Prescription Medicines
Professions and Occupations