VA HB2162 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2162
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medical care facilities; persons with disabilities; designated support persons. Requires every medical care facility, as defined in the bill, to allow a person with a disability who requires assistance as a result of such disability to be accompanied by a designated support person who will provide support and assistance necessary due to the specifics of the person’s disability to the person with a disability during an admission to such medical care facility. The bill (i) defines "person with a disability" and "designated support person"; (ii) provides that a designated support person shall not be subject to restrictions on visitation adopted by the medical care facility but may be required to comply with reasonable requirements of the medical care facility adopted to protect the health and safety of the person with a disability, the designated support person, and staff and other patients of and visitors to the medical care facility; and (iii) authorizes a medical care facility to restrict a designated support person's access to specified areas and movement on the premises of the medical care facility when such restrictions are determined by the medical care facility to be reasonably necessary to protect the health and safety of the person with a disability, the designated support person, and staff and other patients of and visitors to the medical care facility. The bill requires every medical care facility to adopt protocols to inform patients of their right to be accompanied by a designated support person, and to develop and make available to persons with disabilities written information regarding the right of a person with a disability to be accompanied by a designated support person and policies related thereto. The bill contains an emergency clause and directs the Board of Health to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill. Medical care facilities; persons with disabilities; designated support persons. Requires every medical care facility, as defined in the bill, to allow a person with a disability who requires assistance as a result of such disability to be accompanied by a designated support person who will provide support and assistance necessary due to the specifics of the person’s disability to the person with a disability during an admission to such medical care facility. The bill (i) defines "person with a disability" and "designated support person"; (ii) provides that a designated support person shall not be subject to restrictions on visitation adopted by the medical care facility but may be required to comply with reasonable requirements of the medical care facility adopted to protect the health and safety of the person with a disability, the designated support person, and staff and other patients of and visitors to the medical care facility; and (iii) authorizes a medical care facility to restrict a designated support person's access to specified areas and movement on the premises of the medical care facility when such restrictions are determined by the medical care facility to be reasonably necessary to protect the health and safety of the person with a disability, the designated support person, and staff and other patients of and visitors to the medical care facility. The bill requires every medical care facility to adopt protocols to inform patients of their right to be accompanied by a designated support person, and to develop and make available to persons with disabilities written information regarding the right of a person with a disability to be accompanied by a designated support person and policies related thereto. The bill contains an emergency clause and directs the Board of Health to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill.
Title
Medical care facilities; designated support persons for persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Candi Mundon King [D] | Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 220 (effective 3/18/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2162ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 21103593D-EH1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB2162EH1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment by Delegate Tran agreed to |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendments by Delegate Tran from 1/29 withdrawn |
2021-02-01 | House | Emergency clause added |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103593D-H1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103593D-H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-23 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102505D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2162 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)