VA HB2162 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Medical care facilities; persons with disabilities; designated support persons. Requires every medical care facility, as defined in the bill, to allow a person with a disability who requires assistance as a result of such disability to be accompanied by a designated support person who will provide support and assistance necessary due to the specifics of the person’s disability to the person with a disability during an admission to such medical care facility. The bill (i) defines "person with a disability" and "designated support person"; (ii) provides that a designated support person shall not be subject to restrictions on visitation adopted by the medical care facility but may be required to comply with reasonable requirements of the medical care facility adopted to protect the health and safety of the person with a disability, the designated support person, and staff and other patients of and visitors to the medical care facility; and (iii) authorizes a medical care facility to restrict a designated support person's access to specified areas and movement on the premises of the medical care facility when such restrictions are determined by the medical care facility to be reasonably necessary to protect the health and safety of the person with a disability, the designated support person, and staff and other patients of and visitors to the medical care facility. The bill requires every medical care facility to adopt protocols to inform patients of their right to be accompanied by a designated support person, and to develop and make available to persons with disabilities written information regarding the right of a person with a disability to be accompanied by a designated support person and policies related thereto. The bill contains an emergency clause and directs the Board of Health to adopt emergency regulations within 280 days of the bill's enactment. Medical care facilities; persons with disabilities; designated support persons. Requires every medical care facility, as defined in the bill, to allow a person with a disability who requires assistance as a result of such disability to be accompanied by a designated support person who will provide support and assistance necessary due to the specifics of the person’s disability to the person with a disability during an admission to such medical care facility. The bill (i) defines "person with a disability" and "designated support person"; (ii) provides that a designated support person shall not be subject to restrictions on visitation adopted by the medical care facility but may be required to comply with reasonable requirements of the medical care facility adopted to protect the health and safety of the person with a disability, the designated support person, and staff and other patients of and visitors to the medical care facility; and (iii) authorizes a medical care facility to restrict a designated support person's access to specified areas and movement on the premises of the medical care facility when such restrictions are determined by the medical care facility to be reasonably necessary to protect the health and safety of the person with a disability, the designated support person, and staff and other patients of and visitors to the medical care facility. The bill requires every medical care facility to adopt protocols to inform patients of their right to be accompanied by a designated support person, and to develop and make available to persons with disabilities written information regarding the right of a person with a disability to be accompanied by a designated support person and policies related thereto. The bill contains an emergency clause and directs the Board of Health to adopt emergency regulations within 280 days of the bill's enactment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical care facilities; designated support persons for persons with disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-02HouseVOTE: Passage Emergency (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 21103593D-EH1
2021-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB2162EH1
2021-02-01HouseAmendment by Delegate Tran agreed to
2021-02-01HouseAmendments by Delegate Tran from 1/29 withdrawn
2021-02-01HouseEmergency clause added
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103593D-H1
2021-02-01HouseRead second time
2021-01-29HousePassed by for the day
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103593D-H1
2021-01-26HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-23HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102505D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321137.08(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2162
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2162+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2162H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2162EH1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2162AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2162AHR
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103593D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103593.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2162F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2162FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2162FEH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1201V0010+HB2162
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0076+HB2162
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1330+HB2162
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0122+HB2162

Bill Comments 750

feedback