VA HB2162 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Kinship foster care; notice; family assessments. Requires local boards of social services, when identifying foster care placement options, to (i) determine whether the child has any relatives who may be eligible to become a kinship foster parent, (ii) provide notice to such relatives of their potential eligibility to become a kinship foster parent, and (iii) explain to such relatives any opportunities they may have to participate in the placement and care of the child, including opportunities available through kinship foster care or kinship guardianship. The bill also requires local departments, when conducting a family assessment pursuant to a valid report of child abuse or neglect, to file a motion with the court for a preliminary protective order if the family agrees to a safety plan that includes a temporary diversion of the child to the care of a relative for a period longer than 60 days. In the event the child may not return home after 180 days, the bill requires the local department to petition the court for necessary services, which may include the removal of the child or his siblings from the home or the transfer of custody to the relative with whom the child resided pursuant to the temporary diversion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kinship foster care; notice, family assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103940D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321503(n/a)See Bill Text
6321504(n/a)See Bill Text
6321506(n/a)See Bill Text
632900.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback