VA HB2162 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Health and Human Resources to convene work group to study barriers to treatment of substance-exposed infants in the Commonwealth. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Resources (the Secretary) to convene a work group to study barriers to treatment of substance-exposed infants in the Commonwealth. Such work group shall include representatives of the Departments of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and Health and Social Services and such other stakeholders as the Secretary may deem appropriate and shall (i) review current policies and practices governing the identification and treatment of substance-exposed infants in the Commonwealth; (ii) identify barriers to treatment of substance-exposed infants in the Commonwealth, including barriers related to identification and reporting of such infants, data collection, interagency coordination and collaboration, service planning, service availability, and funding; and (iii) develop legislative, budgetary, and policy recommendations for the elimination of barriers to treatment of substance-exposed infants in the Commonwealth. The Secretary shall report his findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2017. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Substance-exposed infants; study of barriers to treatment in Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 197 (effective 2/23/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2162ER) |
2017-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 17100769D-E |
2017-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2162E |
2017-01-30 | House | Emergency clause added |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100769D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Emergency Legislation
Health and Human Resources Secretary of
Infants
Minors
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Emergency Legislation
Health and Human Resources Secretary of
Infants
Minors
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation