VA HB2162 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Apportionment of corporate income tax; taxpayers with enterprise data center operations. Requires taxpayers with certain enterprise data center operations to use a formula for apportioning taxable income to the Commonwealth based on multiplying their incomes by the sales factor. The apportionment formula would apply only to taxpayers that have entered into a memorandum of understanding with the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority to make a new capital investment of at least $150 million in an enterprise data center on or after July 1, 2015, and such taxpayer would begin using the formula in the taxable year that the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority certifies that the investment has been completed. The provisions of the bill would be effective for taxable years beginning July 1, 2016, and would be phased in with the apportionment formula having a 100 percent sales factor by July 1, 2017.
Title
Income tax, corporate; taxable income of taxpayers with enterprise data center operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 237 (effective - 7/1/15 see bill) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2162ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2162H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104761D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104761D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102105D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1142 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0092)