VA HB2161 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Health and Human Resources; workgroup to establish educational guidelines for training health care providers in the safe prescribing and appropriate use of opioids. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to convene a workgroup that shall include representatives of the Departments of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Health, and Health Professions as well as representatives of the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia and each of the Commonwealth's medical schools, dental schools, schools of pharmacy, physician assistant education programs, and nursing education programs to develop educational standards and curricula for training health care providers, including physicians, dentists, optometrists, pharmacists, physician assistants, and nurses, in the safe and appropriate use of opioids to treat pain while minimizing the risk of addiction and substance abuse. The workgroup shall report its progress and the outcomes of its activities to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2017. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is identical to SB 1179.
Title
Opioids; workgroup to establish guidelines for prescribing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0180) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 180 (effective 2/23/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2161ER) |
2017-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 17100758D-E |
2017-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2161E |
2017-01-30 | House | Emergency clause added |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100758D |
Subjects
Emergency Legislation
Health
Narcotics and Drugs
Opiates and Opioids
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Health
Narcotics and Drugs
Opiates and Opioids
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation