VA HB2159 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Release of balloon prohibited; civil penalty. Prohibits any individual 16 years of age or older or other person, including a corporation, from intentionally releasing, discarding, or causing to be released or discarded any nonbiodegradable balloon outdoors and provides that any person convicted of such violation is liable for a civil penalty of $25 per balloon, to be paid into the Game Protection Fund. The bill provides that if a person under the age of 16 releases a balloon at the instruction of an adult, the adult shall be liable for the civil penalty. Current law prohibits a person from knowingly releasing 50 or more such balloons within an hour and sets the civil penalty at $5 per balloon, with the proceeds deposited into the Lifetime Hunting and Fishing Endowment Fund. Release of balloon prohibited; civil penalty. Prohibits any individual 16 years of age or older or other person, including a corporation, from intentionally releasing, discarding, or causing to be released or discarded any nonbiodegradable balloon outdoors and provides that any person convicted of such violation is liable for a civil penalty of $25 per balloon, to be paid into the Game Protection Fund. The bill provides that if a person under the age of 16 releases a balloon at the instruction of an adult, the adult shall be liable for the civil penalty. Current law prohibits a person from knowingly releasing 50 or more such balloons within an hour and sets the civil penalty at $5 per balloon, with the proceeds deposited into the Lifetime Hunting and Fishing Endowment Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Balloons; release of nonbiodegradable balloons outdoors prohibited, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N 1-A) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N 1-A)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House (59-Y 40-N 1-A)
2021-01-22HousePrinted as engrossed 21102435D-E
2021-01-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2159E
2021-01-22HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-22HouseRead second time
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102435D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291556.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2159
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2159+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2159E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2159AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103384A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2159F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2159FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0103V0002+HB2159
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0103V0007+HB2159
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0103V0012+HB2159
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H01V0038+HB2159
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1052+HB2159
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S01V0076+HB2159

Bill Comments 750

feedback