VA HB2157 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Third or subsequent violation of family abuse protective order; private security services. Authorizes courts, upon a defendant's third or subsequent violation of certain family abuse protective orders against the same victim, to modify such order to require that the defendant provide private security services for the victim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family abuse protective order; third or subsequent violation of order.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-07HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2017-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100883D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161253.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback