VA HB2157 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions; checks. Repeals the requirement that checks and similar instruments of a financial institution located in the Commonwealth display the month and year in which the account was opened.
Title
Financial institutions; checks required to show date account was opened.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. David Ramadan [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030) | |
2013-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 30 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2157ER) |
2013-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101731D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1249 (Same As) 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0102)