VA HB2156 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Nursing home staffing and care standards; study. Requires regulations establishing the staffing and care standards in nursing homes to require a minimum number of hours of direct care services to each resident per 24-hour period, which minimum increases in specified phases from 3.5 hours to 4.1 hours. The bill also directs the Joint Commission on Health Care to study issues related to establishment of a minimum number of hours of direct care services for nursing homes as part of its study of the nursing facility workforce authorized by the Commission on December 15, 2020, and to report its findings by December 1, 2021. The regulatory provisions of the bill have a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing home staffing and care standards; regulations, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-21HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102700D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321127(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback