VA HB2156 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0196)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Licensure of facilities operated by agencies of the Commonwealth. Provides for licensure of child welfare agencies operated by agencies of the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child welfare agencies; licensure for agencies operated by the Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0196)
2017-02-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 196 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017
2017-02-17HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17
2017-02-17SenateSigned by President
2017-02-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-16HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2156ER)
2017-02-16HouseEnrolled
2017-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14SenateRead third time
2017-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-10SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N)
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2017-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2156H1
2017-02-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104851D-H1
2017-02-03HouseRead second time
2017-02-02HousePassed by for the day
2017-02-01HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104851D-H1
2017-01-31HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2017-01-24HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100632D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321701(n/a)See Bill Text
6321709(n/a)See Bill Text
6321709.2(n/a)See Bill Text
6321710(n/a)See Bill Text
6321710.1(n/a)See Bill Text
6321710.2(n/a)See Bill Text
6321737(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2156
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2156+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2156H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2156ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0196+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1202V0009+HB2156
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H12V0124+HB2156
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1900+HB2156
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S09V0090+HB2156
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0494HB2156+HB2156
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0522HB2156+HB2156

Bill Comments 750

feedback