VA HB2155 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Human Rights Act; nondiscrimination in employment; sexual harassment and workplace harassment. Makes it an unlawful discrimatory practice for an employer, labor organization, or employment agency to engage in workplace harassment, including sexual harassment, as defined in the bill. The bill also provides (i) a nonexhaustive list of factors to consider when determining whether certain conduct constitutes workplace harassment, (ii) guidelines for when a court may find an employer liable for workplace harassment, (iii) that a person claiming to be aggrieved by an unlawful discriminatory practice may file a written complaint with the Division of Human Rights within two years of the occurrence of the alleged unlawful discriminatory practice, and (iv) that an aggrieved person who has been provided a notice of his right to file a civil action for such grievance may do so within one year of receiving such notice. The bill also amends the definition of "employer" to mean a person employing five or more employees, instead of 15 or more employees under current law, for each working day in each of 20 or more calendar weeks in the current or preceding calendar year, and any agent of such a person. Virginia Human Rights Act; nondiscrimination in employment; sexual harassment and workplace harassment. Makes it an unlawful discrimatory practice for an employer, labor organization, or employment agency to engage in workplace harassment, including sexual harassment, as defined in the bill. The bill also provides (i) a nonexhaustive list of factors to consider when determining whether certain conduct constitutes workplace harassment, (ii) guidelines for when a court may find an employer liable for workplace harassment, (iii) that a person claiming to be aggrieved by an unlawful discriminatory practice may file a written complaint with the Division of Human Rights within two years of the occurrence of the alleged unlawful discriminatory practice, and (iv) that an aggrieved person who has been provided a notice of his right to file a civil action for such grievance may do so within one year of receiving such notice. The bill also amends the definition of "employer" to mean a person employing five or more employees, instead of 15 or more employees under current law, for each working day in each of 20 or more calendar weeks in the current or preceding calendar year, and any agent of such a person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Human Rights Act; nondiscrimination in employment, sexual and workplace harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2155H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103989D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103989D-H1
2021-01-28HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-27HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102802D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223905(n/a)See Bill Text
223905.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223908(n/a)See Bill Text
22522(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2155
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2155+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2155H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103926.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103926D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2155F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2155FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1101V0012+HB2155
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H11V0074+HB2155
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1393+HB2155
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0147+HB2155

Bill Comments

feedback