VA HB2155 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Technical corrections for administration of the insurance premiums license tax. Makes technical corrections to facilitate the transfer of the administration of the state insurance premiums license tax from the State Corporation Commission to the Department of Taxation pursuant to legislation passed by the 2011 Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Insurance premiums license tax; technical corrections for administration.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029) | |
2013-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 29 (effective 1/1/13) | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2155ER) |
2013-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 13103456D-E |
2013-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2155E |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #3 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103456D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1216 (Same As) 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 4809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4809.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2525 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2526 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2527 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |