VA HB2153 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-20 - Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 13-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Assistance to certain voters; curbside voting; right to observe ballot deposited into ballot scanner machine or ballot container. Provides that, upon the request of the voter, a curbside voter shall be permitted to enter the polling place after marking his ballot in order to observe his ballot being deposited into the ballot container or ballot scanner machine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Curbside voting; right to observe ballot deposited into ballot scanner machine or ballot container.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-20 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 13-N) (Y: 8 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-20HouseFailed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 13-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Election Administration
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102221D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242649(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback