VA HB2152 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Hopewell; water renewal commission. Changes the membership of the Hopewell Water Renewal Commission (the Commission) from a total of eight members appointed by the city council, five of whom are nominees of five manufacturers, to up to nine members, three of whom shall be a member of the city council, the city manager, and the city attorney, and the remainder of whom shall be appointed by the city council from nominees each submitted by a manufacturer who shall provide a capital contribution in an amount determined by the city council. The bill removes the city council's authority to provide for additional nominees to the Commission by manufacturers not involved in planning assistance and requires the Commission to assist in the maintenance and expansion of the city's regional wastewater treatment facility. This bill is identical to SB 992.
Title
Charter; City of Hopewell; water renewal commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0391) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 391 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2152ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2152H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104755D-H1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104755D-H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102879D |