VA HB2152 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Defeated by Senate (2-Y 36-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Defeated by Senate (2-Y 36-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Write-in votes; duties of the electoral boards. Provides that when no person is elected to an office by write-in votes and the total number of write-in votes for that office is less than 95 percent of the total number of votes cast for the candidate receiving the most votes in the election district, the electoral board is not required to ascertain the total number of write-in votes cast for each person receiving write-in votes, but is required to ascertain the total number of write-in votes cast for that office in the locality. If an office in which the total number of write-in votes cast in the election district exceeds (i) the highest number of votes cast for any candidate whose name appears on the ballot or (ii) 95 percent of the total number of votes cast for the candidate receiving the highest number of votes for that office, each electoral board in that election district is required to ascertain the total votes for each write-in candidate for the office within one week following the election.
Title
Write-in votes; duties of the electoral boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (2-Y 36-N) (Y: 2 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (2-Y 36-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 15102594D-E |
2015-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2152E |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102594D |