VA HB2151 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State parks; master planning requirements. Increases from $500,000 to $2 million the value of physical improvements and structures in state parks that are considered substantial improvements, as defined in the bill. The bill also stipulates that the master planning process shall not be considered an impediment to the acquisition of inholdings, adjacent properties to be incorporated into an existing park, or properties acquired for the development of a new park. Such properties, when acquired, shall be incorporated into a park's existing master plan as part of that plan's next scheduled 10-year review and update, or for new parks, a master plan shall be initiated within five years of finalizing the acquisition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State parks; master planning requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
2023-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 194 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2151ER)
2023-02-24HouseEnrolled
2023-02-21SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-21SenateRead third time
2023-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-02-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2023-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2023-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-31HouseVOTE: Passage (91-Y 8-N)
2023-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N)
2023-01-30HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-27HouseRead first time
2023-01-25HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N)
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103992D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101107(n/a)See Bill Text
101200.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB2151
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2151+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2151ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0194+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2151F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2151FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H01V0029+HB2151
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1252+HB2151
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S01V0099+HB2151
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0457+HB2151
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0630HB2151+HB2151
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0679HB2151+HB2151

Bill Comments

feedback