VA HB2150 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Trace evidence collection kit. Provides for the collection, retention, and storage of a trace evidence collection kit or anonymous trace evidence collection kit, defined in the bill, collected as part of a forensic medical examination of a victim of strangulation, with some procedures that parallel existing procedures for the collection, retention, and storage of physical evidence recovery kits collected for victims of sexual assault. The bill requires the Commonwealth to pay all medical fees relating to the collection of a trace evidence collection kit and does not require victims complaining of strangulation to participate in the criminal justice system or cooperate with law-enforcement authorities in order to be provided with such forensic medical examination. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2025. Trace evidence collection kit. Provides for the collection, retention, and storage of a trace evidence collection kit or anonymous trace evidence collection kit, defined in the bill, collected as part of a forensic medical examination of a victim of strangulation, with some procedures that parallel existing procedures for the collection, retention, and storage of physical evidence recovery kits collected for victims of sexual assault. The bill requires the Commonwealth to pay all medical fees relating to the collection of a trace evidence collection kit and does not require victims complaining of strangulation to participate in the criminal justice system or cooperate with law-enforcement authorities in order to be provided with such forensic medical examination. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2025.
Title
Trace evidence collection kit; collection, retention, and storage of kits, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 312 (effective 7/1/25) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2150ER) |
2023-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2150H1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105674D-H1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105674D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104237D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 11.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |