VA HB2150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemption for the elderly and disabled; improvements to a dwelling. Provides that, for purposes of the real property tax exemption for the elderly and disabled, certain improvements to exempt land and the land such improvements are situated on shall be included as part of the dwelling and exempt from tax. This bill is identical to SB 1196.
Title
Real property tax; exemption for the elderly and disabled, improvements to a dwelling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 736 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2150ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (84-Y 14-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance (16-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103446D |