VA HB2147 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2147
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Division of Human Rights; renamed as Office of Civil Rights. Renames the Division of Human Rights in the Department of Law as the Office of Civil Rights.
Title
Human Rights, Division of; renamed as Office of Civil Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (49-Y 46-N) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (24-Y 62-N) (Y: 24 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (49-Y 46-N) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (24-Y 62-N) (Y: 24 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (49-Y 46-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (49-Y 46-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (24-Y 62-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Substitute by Delegate Jones rejected 21104103D-H1 (24-Y 62-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | House | Floor substitute printed 21104103D-H1 (Jones) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102585D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2147 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 522 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |