VA HB2146 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2146
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Parked cars; VDOT right-of-way. Authorizes vehicles to be stopped or parked in an unoccupied Department of Transportation right-of-way adjacent to a highway in case of an emergency, accident, or mechanical breakdown. The bill clarifies that the term "emergency" includes retrieving a companion animal from a highway or area adjacent to a highway. Parked cars; VDOT right-of-way. Authorizes vehicles to be stopped or parked in an unoccupied Department of Transportation right-of-way adjacent to a highway in case of an emergency, accident, or mechanical breakdown. The bill clarifies that the term "emergency" includes retrieving a companion animal from a highway or area adjacent to a highway.
Title
Parked cars; VDOT right-of-way.
Sponsors
Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 28-N) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 28-N) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (70-Y 28-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (70-Y 28-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101099D-E |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2146E |
2021-02-02 | House | Amendment by Delegate Miyares agreed to |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Transportation (16-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101099D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2146 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)